THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:18:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
24 Finsbury Ave
Newlands
Cape Town Western Cape 7700
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2721-6713264
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Practice Address Not Available
24 Finsbury Ave
Newlands
Cape Town Western Cape 7700
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2721-6713264
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: La Verendrye Hospital Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MENDEL KIRSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MENDEL KIRSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRSCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2003