THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Rd
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
East York ON M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-425-6220
Extension: 6123
Fax: 416-424-3828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Kilgour Rd
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
East York ON M4G 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-425-6220
Extension: 6123
Fax: 416-424-3828

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CATHERINE MCADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCADAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA CATHERINE MCADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCADAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2003