THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:02:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
New Clinical Services Building
11th Floor Room 1170
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
New Clinical Services Building
11th Floor Room 1170
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL HAKEEM YAQOOB IBRAHIM AL HASHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HASHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDUL HAKEEM YAQOOB IBRAHIM AL HASHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL HASHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2003