THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:16:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Care
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 7432121
Extension: 5188
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kebby King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Care
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 7432121
Extension: 5188
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kebby King Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEBBY FAME GENEETH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEBBY FAME GENEETH KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 May 2003