THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:25:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-1673 Richmond St
PMB 513
London ON N6G 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2494963298
Fax: 5192866517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Mayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-1673 Richmond St
PMB 513
London ON N6G 2N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2494963298
Fax: 5192866517

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Mayer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003