THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:11:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue, Room C2182b
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4709
Fax: (613) 761-5360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dowlatshahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Dec 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue, Room C2182b
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4709
Fax: (613) 761-5360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dowlatshahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Dec 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIUSH DOWLATSHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWLATSHAHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIUSH DOWLATSHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWLATSHAHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003