THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road, Room 3031
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road, Room 3031
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE PHAM-HUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM-HUY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE PHAM-HUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM-HUY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003