THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:48:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-3080
Fax: (905) 997-3088

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aida Hasic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5N 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-3080
Fax: (905) 997-3088

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aida Hasic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Sep 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA HASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AIDA HASIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2003