THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2038 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1R 1V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 447-7000
Fax: (416) 447-7072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Rupert Abdalian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2038 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1R 1V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 447-7000
Fax: (416) 447-7072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 07 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Rupert Abdalian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUPERT SEVAG ABDALIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUPERT SEVAG ABDALIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003