THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:44:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Neurology
01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: EL - Neurology
DATE: 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003