THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Aug 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE: 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003