THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:39:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
8th Floor Black Wing, Room 8409
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-6531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
8th Floor Black Wing, Room 8409
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Fax: (416) 813-6531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHARINE MARGARET WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHARINE MARGARET WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003