THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:48:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GAELIC
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island
Ireland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MARTIN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MARTIN KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2011


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003