THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (289) 386-0811
Fax: (289) 715-2231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pfeiffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (289) 386-0811
Fax: (289) 715-2231

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 2005
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pfeiffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Nov 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 30 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Any Zuleika Pfeiffer may practise medicine independently in
Paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Any Zuleika Pfeiffer may practise medicine independently in
Paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003