THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 17:50:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1133 Sheppard Ave W
Defence Research & Development Canada
North York ON M3K 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-2000
Extension: 2014
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1133 Sheppard Ave W
Defence Research & Development Canada
North York ON M3K 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-2000
Extension: 2014
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN ZANE NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHAN ZANE NUGENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NUGENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Sep 2023
Summary of Decision:
On September 26, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Nugent had been found guilty of the offence of assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code, which was relevant to his suitability to practise. The Tribunal further found that the conduct underlying this finding of guilt was conduct unbecoming a physician and conduct that would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Tribunal also found that Dr. Nugent engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to disclose to the College that he was charged with criminal offences and was subject to conditions of release.

The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Nugent attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration for three (3) months commencing September 27, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Nugent pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by November 10, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; 2023-09-26

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Sep 2023
Summary of Decision:
On September 26, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Nugent had been found guilty of the offence of assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code, which was relevant to his suitability to practise. The Tribunal further found that the conduct underlying this finding of guilt was conduct unbecoming a physician and conduct that would be reasonably regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Tribunal also found that Dr. Nugent engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to disclose to the College that he was charged with criminal offences and was subject to conditions of release.

The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Nugent attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration for three (3) months commencing September 27, 2023 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Nugent’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Nugent pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by November 10, 2023.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
 
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; 2023-09-26

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2024
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 27 Dec 2023
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 27 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003