THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 34253
Fax: (905) 721-4742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 34253
Fax: (905) 721-4742

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIA SANDA RACICOVSCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACICOVSCHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIA SANDA RACICOVSCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACICOVSCHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003