THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:24:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 604
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 204-9200
Fax: (416) 915-9967

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 604
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 204-9200
Fax: (416) 915-9967

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Nov 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 17 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karen Bir may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Karen Bir may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003