THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:01:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric
Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 201503
Fax: (416) 813-8024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Dec 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric
Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 201503
Fax: (416) 813-8024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Dec 2006
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Uri Yaakov Tabori may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Tabori holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Tabori no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.





VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Uri Yaakov Tabori may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Tabori holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Tabori no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.





Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2003