THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:24:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Dundas St. E.
Suite 303
Belleville Ontario K8N 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7777
Fax: (613) 961-7773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Dundas St. E.
Suite 303
Belleville Ontario K8N 5K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7777
Fax: (613) 961-7773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Mar 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Duska Vukojevic may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and
gynaecology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Duska Vukojevic may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and
gynaecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univerziteta "Djuro Pucar Stari" U Banja, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2003