THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:12:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Oakvillage Medical Clinic for instructions on obtaining medical records:

J6- 261 Oak Walk Dr
Oakville, ON L6H 6M3
905 257 5200
Date Received: 29 Nov 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahir Noori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please contact Oakvillage Medical Clinic for instructions on obtaining medical records:

J6- 261 Oak Walk Dr
Oakville, ON L6H 6M3
905 257 5200
Date Received: 29 Nov 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahir Noori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Aug 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2003
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2003