THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:01:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Dalby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Dalby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANN DALBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LISA ANN DALBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 May 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2003