THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:05:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shapir Jasovich, Marcia Helena (Used Until: 24 Aug 2004)
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 501
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-7389
Fax: (416) 929-7390

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Shapir Jasovich, Marcia Helena (Used Until: 24 Aug 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 501
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-7389
Fax: (416) 929-7390

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 15 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA HELENA SHAPIR KAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIR KAHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCIA HELENA SHAPIR KAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIR KAHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003