THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-8428
Fax: (416) 586-8387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 08 May 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alarab Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynaecology
Suite 8-816
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-8428
Fax: (416) 586-8387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 08 May 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alarab Awad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 May 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Mar 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. May Alarab may practise medicine independently in Obstetrics and Gynaecology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. May Alarab may practise medicine independently in Obstetrics and Gynaecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 May 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2004