THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William D. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 395 Carrie St
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Strathroy ON N7G 3C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-5295
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 25 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William D. Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DANIEL ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM DANIEL ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2004