THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Byward Family Health Team
Departmant of Paediatrics
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Extension: 450
Fax: 613 564-6627
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
Diabetes team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 613 737 7600
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Byward Family Health Team
Departmant of Paediatrics
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa Ontario K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Extension: 450
Fax: 613 564-6627
Address: 401 Smyth Rd
CHEO
Diabetes team
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 613 737 7600
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 17 Aug 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 May 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 17 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Radmila Jovanovic may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics, only.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Radmila Jovanovic may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics, only.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Belgrade, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2004
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2004