THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Faisal University, College of Medicine in Al-Ahsa, 2000
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
31 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
05 Apr 2004 to 30 May 2004
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 31 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 05 Apr 2004 to 30 May 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2004