THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:15:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Haematology / Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 205886
Fax: (416) 813-5327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Mar 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Division of Haematology / Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 205886
Fax: (416) 813-5327

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 31 Mar 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Apr 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 12 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Leonardo Rodriques Brandao may practise medicine independently in
Paediatric Haematology, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Leonardo Rodriques Brandao may practise medicine independently in
Paediatric Haematology, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sao Paulo, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2004