THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-1198
Fax: (705) 726-6229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Previous patients of Dr. Szelag may request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Dr. Christopher Vinoharan Navachandrabala (CPSO# 128034)
190 Cundles Rd E
Suite 203
Barrie, ON
L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 549-3433
Fax: (705) 812-1615
Date Received: 28 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marek Szelag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
190 Cundles Road East
Barrie Ontario L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-1198
Fax: (705) 726-6229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Previous patients of Dr. Szelag may request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

Dr. Christopher Vinoharan Navachandrabala (CPSO# 128034)
190 Cundles Rd E
Suite 203
Barrie, ON
L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 549-3433
Fax: (705) 812-1615
Date Received: 28 May 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marek Szelag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAREK ANDRZEJ SZELAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZELAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAREK ANDRZEJ SZELAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZELAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2004