THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:13:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Public Health Ontario
661 University Ave.
17th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-260-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Suite 101
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Phone: 905-318-0303
Fax: 905-318-3050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Public Health Ontario
661 University Ave.
17th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-260-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 565 Sanatorium Rd
Suite 101
Hamilton ON L9C 7N4
Phone: 905-318-0303
Fax: 905-318-3050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA PATRICIA HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA PATRICIA HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004