THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:40:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004