THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6218
Fax: (416) 813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6218
Fax: (416) 813-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYZEL MALKA SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYZEL MALKA SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004