THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:44:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health - ER
89 Norman street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health - ER
89 Norman street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN DIRK PUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAN DIRK PUTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2004