THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:47:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Manitoba Clinic
790 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3A 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-788-5529
Fax: 204-784-2547

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Garyounis University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Manitoba Clinic
790 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg Manitoba R3A 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 204-788-5529
Fax: 204-784-2547

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 20 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MOHAMED ALI ABDELGADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGADIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MOHAMED ALI ABDELGADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELGADIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2004