THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent St. South, 2nd Floor
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-7381
Fax: (705) 671-7382
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angele Brabant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brabant (CPSO#: 80830 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
2nd Floor
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 671-7381

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent St. South, 2nd Floor
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 671-7381
Fax: (705) 671-7382
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angele Brabant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brabant (CPSO#: 80830 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
2nd Floor
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 671-7381

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELE YVETTE BRABANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRABANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELE YVETTE BRABANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRABANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004