THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:19:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Gatineau
Centre de Cancerologie
909 boul La Verendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Gatineau
Centre de Cancerologie
909 boul La Verendrye Ouest
Gatineau Quebec J8P 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANYA TERESA MARIA DI VALENTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI VALENTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANYA TERESA MARIA DI VALENTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI VALENTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004