THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:25:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SickKids Hospital - Nephrology
555 University avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G1X8 - Canada
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 309419
Fax: (416) 813-6271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SickKids Hospital - Nephrology
555 University avenue
Toronto, Ontario
M5G1X8 - Canada
Toronto Ontario M5G 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-7654
Extension: 309419
Fax: (416) 813-6271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU LEMAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMAIRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHIEU LEMAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMAIRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004