THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:06:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168643011
Fax: 4168643099
Address: IWHC Toronto
489 College Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A5
Phone: 416-323-9986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: 416-922-0566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Wijayasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Centre at 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168643011
Fax: 4168643099
Address: IWHC Toronto
489 College Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M6G 1A5
Phone: 416-323-9986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hassle Free Clinic
66 Gerrard Street, Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M5B 1G3
Phone: 416-922-0566
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Wijayasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA WIJAYASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJAYASINGHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA WIJAYASINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIJAYASINGHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004