THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:02:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 405
Markham Ontario L6B1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-5517
Fax: 905-554-1223
Address: Royal Victoria
Regional Health Centre
Barrie Ontario L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P7P3
Phone: 905-472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 405
Markham Ontario L6B1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-5517
Fax: 905-554-1223
Address: Royal Victoria
Regional Health Centre
Barrie Ontario L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P7P3
Phone: 905-472-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POLI LEKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEKAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POLI LEKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEKAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004