THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. SHOKRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shokri (CPSO#: 81234 )

Corporation Name: Sharareh Shokri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. SHOKRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shokri (CPSO#: 81234 )

Corporation Name: Sharareh Shokri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARAREH SHOKRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOKRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARAREH SHOKRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOKRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004