THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:12:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-1693
Fax: (416) 297-4870

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sorin Palcu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Palcu (CPSO#: 81310 )
Business Address: 204-3251 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3W5
416-297-1693

Corporation Name: Dr. Sorin Palcu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1T 3W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-1693
Fax: (416) 297-4870

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sorin Palcu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Palcu (CPSO#: 81310 )
Business Address: 204-3251 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3W5
416-297-1693

Corporation Name: Dr. Sorin Palcu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SORIN PALCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALCU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SORIN PALCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALCU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004