THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:57:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Sylvan St
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXINE ALEXIS CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAXINE ALEXIS CARLISLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARLISLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004