THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 200
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruksana Nasreen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 200
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ruksana Nasreen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUKSANA NASREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASREEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUKSANA NASREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASREEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dhaka, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004