THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:30:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Imaging and Ultrasound
3rd Avenue Belleville
Bridgetown St. Michael BB11114
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 246-426-2750
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dean Christopher Dalton Durant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Imaging and Ultrasound
3rd Avenue Belleville
Bridgetown St. Michael BB11114
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 246-426-2750
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dean Christopher Dalton Durant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2015

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN CHRISTOPHER DALTON DURANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEAN CHRISTOPHER DALTON DURANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004