THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:05:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room B1-116
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayna Zelcer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Zelcer Schreier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room B1-116
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8494
Fax: (519) 685-8384

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shayna Zelcer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Zelcer Schreier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Sep 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAYNA MIRIAM ZELCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELCER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAYNA MIRIAM ZELCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELCER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2004