THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1230 Talbot St
St Thomas ON N5P 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-9900
Extension: 1207
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 404-460 Main Street East
Locke Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Phone: 9055700440
Fax: 9055700545
Address: 100 Main Street West
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-546-2424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Locke Street Medical Clinic
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4B4
Phone: (905) 570-0440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1230 Talbot St
St Thomas ON N5P 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-9900
Extension: 1207
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 404-460 Main Street East
Locke Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8N
Phone: 9055700440
Fax: 9055700545
Address: 100 Main Street West
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-546-2424
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Locke Street Medical Clinic
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4B4
Phone: (905) 570-0440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINH NGOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NINH NGOC TRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2004