THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:11:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kalinin State Medical Institute, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-275 Slater St
Ottawa ON K1P 5H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-231-3666
Fax: 613-231-4551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sannoufi (CPSO#: 81658 )
Business Address: La Vie Health Centre
Suite 150
525 Legget Drive
Kanata Ontario K2K 2W2
(613) 592-0862
Business Address: 20-275 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5H9
(613) 231-3666
Business Address: 940-100 Queen St
La Vie Executive Health Centre
Ottawa ON K1P 1J9
613-231-3666

Corporation Name: Hassan Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Kalinin State Medical Institute, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-275 Slater St
Ottawa ON K1P 5H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-231-3666
Fax: 613-231-4551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sannoufi (CPSO#: 81658 )
Business Address: La Vie Health Centre
Suite 150
525 Legget Drive
Kanata Ontario K2K 2W2
(613) 592-0862
Business Address: 20-275 Slater Street
Ottawa Ontario K1P 5H9
(613) 231-3666
Business Address: 940-100 Queen St
La Vie Executive Health Centre
Ottawa ON K1P 1J9
613-231-3666

Corporation Name: Hassan Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN SANNOUFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANNOUFI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN SANNOUFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANNOUFI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kalinin State Medical Institute, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2004

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2004