THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wales, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave
St Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave
Department of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jul 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wales, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave
St Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave
Department of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Healthcare
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 09 Jul 2004
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2009
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2009
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Maxine Anne Lewis may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, McMaster
University, in which Dr. Lewis holds a geographical full-time
teaching or research appointment at the rank of Assosicate
Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
her appointment.
2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr. Lewis
no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Maxine Anne Lewis may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, McMaster
University, in which Dr. Lewis holds a geographical full-time
teaching or research appointment at the rank of Assosicate
Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
her appointment.
2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr. Lewis
no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wales, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2004