THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Grace Hospital
650 Church St
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169252251
Extension: 271
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Grace Hospital
650 Church St
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169252251
Extension: 271
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Nov 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH ANNE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH ANNE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2004