THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:19:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 1997
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
31 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2004 to 30 Aug 2004
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 31 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Aug 2004
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2004