THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:10:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3, Technology Place
Macquarie University
Sydney NSW 2109
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 02 9158 0539
Fax: 02 9430 1199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: Monash University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3, Technology Place
Macquarie University
Sydney NSW 2109
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 02 9158 0539
Fax: 02 9430 1199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Balendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Oct 2013

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NALAYINI BALENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALENDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NALAYINI BALENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2004